Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/26/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/26/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/27/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/29/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/29/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/03/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 02/04/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/15/2010