Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/27/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/14/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/14/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/23/2010