Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/02/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/03/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/03/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 02/03/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 02/04/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/10/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/10/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/10/2010