Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/27/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/27/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/27/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/27/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/02/2010
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/02/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/02/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/22/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/22/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/04/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/09/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/15/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/13/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/13/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/15/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/20/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/20/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/21/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/27/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/05/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/20/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/25/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/25/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/27/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/14/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/17/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/17/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/17/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/17/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/28/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/28/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/16/2010