Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/03/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/04/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/04/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/04/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/04/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/04/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/26/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/26/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/26/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/26/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/26/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/26/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/26/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/04/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/04/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/04/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/12/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/12/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/12/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/22/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/22/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/05/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/09/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/09/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/09/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/23/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/23/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/23/2010