Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/25/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/19/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/20/2010