Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/14/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/20/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/22/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/26/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/26/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/26/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/26/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/27/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/28/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/04/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/04/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/05/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/20/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/24/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/24/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/24/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/25/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 05/27/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/27/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/08/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/08/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/08/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/14/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/24/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/29/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/13/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/13/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/14/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/14/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/19/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/26/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/29/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/30/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/16/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/16/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/20/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/20/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/20/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/22/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/23/2010