Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/03/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/03/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/03/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/18/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/20/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/21/2010