Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/02/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/22/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/22/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/29/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/29/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/13/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/28/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/15/2010