Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5]* 02/02/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/02/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/02/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/04/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/04/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/23/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/23/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/23/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/23/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/23/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/25/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/09/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/10/2010