Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/02/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/09/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/12/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/05/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/28/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/28/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/28/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/14/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/20/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/30/2010