There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Disabled Veteran Small Business Eligibility Expansion Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to make service-disabled veterans eligible under the 8(a) business development program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/09/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/09/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Contracting and Technology .
Action By: Committee on Small Business
01/09/2009Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/23/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/11/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business01/09/2009 Referred to
House Small Business Subcommittee on Contracting and Technology01/09/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.456.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.456. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/09/2009)

Disabled Veteran Small Business Eligibility Expansion Act of 2009 - Amends the Small Business Act to make small businesses owned and controlled by service-disabled veterans eligible for the award by the Small Business Administration (SBA) of small business development grants in the same manner as small businesses owned and controlled by socially and economically disadvantaged individuals.