Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/23/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/11/2010