Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/22/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/22/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/22/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/22/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/09/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/16/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/22/2010