Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/02/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/03/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/03/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 02/04/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/22/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/22/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/02/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/02/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/02/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/02/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/02/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 03/03/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/03/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/03/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/03/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/04/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/09/2010