Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/04/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 02/04/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/24/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/24/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/24/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 02/24/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 02/24/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/24/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/24/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/24/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/24/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/24/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/24/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/04/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/11/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/11/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/18/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/18/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/18/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/18/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/18/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/25/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/25/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/13/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/13/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/14/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/14/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/22/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/22/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/22/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/29/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/12/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/12/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/27/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/27/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/27/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/27/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/27/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/10/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/10/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/10/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/10/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/17/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/17/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/17/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/30/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/30/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/30/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/14/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/15/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/27/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/27/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/29/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/14/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/16/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/28/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/28/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 11/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/07/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/14/2010