Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 02/04/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 02/22/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/23/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/23/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/23/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/25/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/25/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/25/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/03/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/03/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/04/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/09/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/15/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/17/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/11/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/26/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/08/2010