Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/23/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/04/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/10/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/11/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/18/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/08/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/08/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/16/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/24/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/14/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/15/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 08/09/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/16/2010