Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/15/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/15/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/15/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/15/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/16/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/16/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/16/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 01/16/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/26/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/26/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/26/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/26/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/26/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/26/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/26/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/26/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/26/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/26/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/27/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/27/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/27/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/27/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/02/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/02/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/02/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/02/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/02/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/12/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/23/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/03/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/09/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/30/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/20/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/28/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/15/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/26/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/24/2010