There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1332 Sharon Copley Road in Sharon Center, Ohio, as the "Emil Bolas Post Office".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-355. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010Presented to President.
12/16/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10365-10366; text as passed Senate: CR S10365)
12/16/2010Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/30/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 9/28/2010 H7029)
02/04/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-355. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010HousePresented to President.
12/17/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/16/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10365-10366; text as passed Senate: CR S10365)
12/16/2010SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/15/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/30/2010-12:28amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2010-12:27amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 9/28/2010 H7029)
09/30/2010-12:27amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7378)
09/28/2010-2:18pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Bilbray objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/28/2010-2:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4602.
09/28/2010-2:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7029)
09/28/2010-2:14pmHouseMr. Driehaus moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/23/2010HouseOrdered to be Reported.
09/23/2010HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/04/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
02/04/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform02/04/2010 Referred to
09/23/2010 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs11/15/2010 Referred to
12/16/2010 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4602.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4602. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-355 (01/04/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1332 Sharon Copley Road in Sharon Center, Ohio, as the "Emil Bolas Post Office."