Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/26/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/26/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/26/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/26/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/26/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/16/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/16/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/17/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/17/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/22/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/20/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/29/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/06/2010