Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/23/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/24/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/24/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/11/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/20/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/18/2010