Text: H.R.4626 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (03/01/2010)

Calendar No. 277

111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 4626

To restore the application of the Federal antitrust laws to the business of health insurance to protect competition and consumers.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
February 25, 2010

Received

February 26, 2010

Read the first time

March 1, 2010

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To restore the application of the Federal antitrust laws to the business of health insurance to protect competition and consumers.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Health Insurance Industry Fair Competition Act”.

SEC. 2. Restoring the application of antitrust laws to health sector insurers.

(a) Amendment to McCarran-Ferguson Act.—Section 3 of the Act of March 9, 1945 (15 U.S.C. 1013), commonly known as the McCarran-Ferguson Act, is amended by adding at the end the following:

“(c) Nothing contained in this Act shall modify, impair, or supersede the operation of any of the antitrust laws with respect to the business of health insurance. For purposes of the preceding sentence, the term ‘antitrust laws’ has the meaning given it in subsection (a) of the first section of the Clayton Act, except that such term includes section 5 of the Federal Trade Commission Act to the extent that such section 5 applies to unfair methods of competition.”.

(b) Related Provision.—For purposes of section 5 of the Federal Trade Commission Act (15 U.S.C. 45) to the extent such section applies to unfair methods of competition, section 3(c) of the McCarran-Ferguson Act shall apply with respect to the business of health insurance without regard to whether such business is carried on for profit, notwithstanding the definition of “Corporation” contained in section 4 of the Federal Trade Commission Act.

Passed the House of Representatives February 24, 2010.

Attest:
Lorraine C. Miller,

Clerk  


Calendar No. 277

111th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 4626

AN ACT
To restore the application of the Federal antitrust laws to the business of health insurance to protect competition and consumers.

March 1, 2010
Read the second time and placed on the calendar