Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/13/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/13/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/27/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 01/27/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/27/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 01/27/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/27/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/27/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/27/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/27/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 02/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/23/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/25/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/06/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/06/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/17/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/23/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/01/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/23/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/05/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/20/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/20/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/15/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/11/2010