Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/22/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/22/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/22/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/22/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/26/2010