Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/02/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/02/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/02/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/02/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/03/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/03/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/03/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/13/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/13/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/13/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/13/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/22/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/22/2010