Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/23/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/23/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 02/23/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 02/25/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/25/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/03/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/03/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/17/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/19/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/13/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/16/2010