There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Wounded Veteran Job Security Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Wounded Veteran Job Security Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Wounded Veteran Job Security Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for certain rights and benefits for persons who are absent from positions of employment to receive medical treatment for service-connected disabilities.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to prohibit discrimination and acts of reprisal against persons who receive treatment for illnesses, injuries, and disabilities incurred in or aggravated by service in the uniformed services.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/08/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6287)
05/19/2009Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-118.
01/13/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/09/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/08/2009-3:43pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/08/2009-3:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/08/2009-3:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6287)
06/08/2009-3:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 466.
06/08/2009-3:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6287-6289)
06/08/2009-3:29pmHouseMr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/19/2009HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 61.
05/19/2009HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-118.
05/06/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/06/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/19/2009HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
03/19/2009HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
03/04/2009HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
01/16/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/13/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
01/13/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs01/13/2009 Referred to
05/06/2009 Markup by
05/19/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-118
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity01/16/2009 Referred to
03/04/2009 Hearings by
03/19/2009 Markup by
03/19/2009 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs06/09/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.466. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/08/2009)

Wounded Veteran Job Security Act - Entitles a person who is absent from employment by reason of the receipt of medical treatment for a service-connected disability (absent employee) to: (1) be retained by the person's employer; (2) the seniority and other rights and benefits determined by seniority that the person had on the commencement of such treatment plus the additional seniority and rights and benefits that the person would have attained if the person had remained continuously employed; and (3) be considered on furlough or leave of absence during such treatment and therefore entitled to other rights and benefits not determined by seniority as are other persons of similar seniority, status, and pay who are on furlough or leave of absence. Terminates such entitlement when a person knowingly provides written notice of the intent not to return to such position following treatment.

Allows the absent employee to use any vacation, annual, medical, or similar leave with pay accrued before the commencement of the treatment.

Provides that an employer shall not be required to comply with the requirements of this Act if: (1) the employer's circumstances have so changed as to make such compliance impossible or unreasonable; (2) such compliance would pose an undue hardship on the employer; or (3) the employment in question is for a brief, nonrecurring period without a reasonable expectation of continuing indefinitely or for a significant period.

Applies health insurance continuation requirements to absences from employment described in this Act.

Prohibits any employer discrimination or acts of reprisal against an absent employee.