Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/02/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/12/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/13/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/21/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/27/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/27/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/12/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/12/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/27/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/27/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/27/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/28/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/09/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/15/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/16/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/23/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/23/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/25/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/29/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/20/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/20/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/20/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/21/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/30/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/14/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/14/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/15/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/30/2010