Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/04/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/13/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/05/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/05/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/05/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/15/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/15/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/25/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/22/2010