Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/02/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 03/23/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/25/2010