Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/04/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/04/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/04/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/15/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/15/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/15/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/15/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/15/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/15/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/15/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/15/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/23/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/23/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/23/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/23/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/24/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/13/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/13/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/14/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/24/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/21/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 07/29/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/28/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/15/2010