Refine your search

Showing 6 of 6 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
08/06/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-221.
08/06/2010 Signed by President.
07/27/2010 Presented to President.
07/22/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6225)
07/20/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5775)
02/24/2010 Introduced in House