Text: H.R.4684 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

08/06/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-221

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Enrolled Bill (08/25/2010)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 111th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 4684 Enrolled Bill (ENR)]

        H.R.4684

                      One Hundred Eleventh Congress

                                 of the

                        United States of America


                          AT THE SECOND SESSION

          Begun and held at the City of Washington on Tuesday,
             the fifth day of January, two thousand and ten


                                 An Act


 
      To require the Secretary of the Treasury to strike medals in 
    commemoration of the 10th anniversary of the September 11, 2001, 
  terrorist attacks on the United States and the establishment of the 
   National September 11 Memorial & Museum at the World Trade Center.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.
    This Act may be cited as the ``National September 11 Memorial & 
Museum Commemorative Medal Act of 2010''.
SEC. 2. STRIKING AND DESIGN OF MEDALS.
    (a) Striking of Medals.--In commemoration of the 10th anniversary 
of the September 11, 2001, terrorist attacks on the United States and 
the establishment of the National September 11 Memorial & Museum at the 
World Trade Center, the Secretary of the Treasury (hereinafter referred 
to as the ``Secretary'') shall strike and make available for sale not 
more than 2,000,000 silver medals, each of which shall contain 1 ounce 
of silver.
    (b) Design Requirement.--
        (1) In general.--The design of the medals struck under this Act 
    shall be emblematic of the courage, sacrifice, and strength of 
    those individuals who perished in the terrorist attacks of 
    September 11, 2001, the bravery of those who risked their lives to 
    save others that day, and the endurance, resilience, and hope of 
    those who survived.
        (2) Inscriptions.--On each medal struck under this Act, there 
    shall be--
            (A) an inscription of the years ``2001-2011''; and
            (B) an inscription of the words ``Always Remember''.
    (c) Selection.--The design for the medals struck under this Act 
shall be--
        (1) selected by the Secretary, after consultation with the 
    National September 11 Memorial & Museum at the World Trade Center 
    and the Commission of Fine Arts; and
        (2) reviewed by the Citizens Coinage Advisory Committee.
SEC. 3. ISSUANCE OF MEDALS.
    (a) Quality of Medals.--The medals struck under this Act shall be 
made available for sale in the quality comparable to proof coins.
    (b) Mint Facility.--
        (1) In general.--Only 2 facilities of the United States Mint 
    may be used to strike medals under this Act.
        (2) Use of the united states mints at west point, new york, and 
    philadelphia, pennsylvania.--It is the sense of Congress that, to 
    the extent possible, approximately one-half of the medals to be 
    struck under this Act should be struck at the United States Mint at 
    West Point, New York, and approximately one-half struck at the 
    United States Mint at Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
    (c) Date of Issuance.--The Secretary may make the medals available 
for sale under this Act beginning on January 1, 2011.
    (d) Termination of Authority.--No medals shall be struck under this 
Act after December 31, 2012.
SEC. 4. NUMISMATIC ITEMS.
    For purposes of sections 5134 and 5136 of title 31, United States 
Code, all medals struck under this Act shall be considered to be 
numismatic items.
SEC. 5. NATIONAL MEDALS.
    The medals struck under this Act are national medals for purposes 
of chapter 51 of title 31, United States Code.
SEC. 6. SALE OF MEDALS.
    (a) Sales Price.--The medals made available for sale under this Act 
shall be sold by the Secretary at a price equal to the sum of--
        (1) the cost of designing and selling such medals (including 
    labor, materials, dies, use of machinery, overhead expenses, 
    marketing, and shipping); and
        (2) the surcharge provided in section 7 with respect to such 
    medals.
    (b) Bulk Sales.--The Secretary shall make bulk sales of the medals 
at a reasonable discount.
    (c) Introductory Orders.--
        (1) In general.--The Secretary shall accept introductory orders 
    for medals made available for sale under this Act.
        (2) Discount.--Sale prices with respect to introductory orders 
    under paragraph (1) shall be made at a reasonable discount.
SEC. 7. SURCHARGES.
    (a) In General.--All sales of medals made available for sale under 
this Act shall include a surcharge of $10 per medal.
    (b) Distribution.--Subject to section 5134(f) of title 31, United 
States Code, all surcharges received by the Secretary from the sale of 
medals under this Act shall be paid to the National September 11 
Memorial & Museum at the World Trade Center to support the operations 
and maintenance of the National September 11 Memorial & Museum at the 
World Trade Center following its completion.
    (c) Audits.--The Comptroller General of the United States shall 
have the right to examine such books, records, documents, and other 
data of the National September 11 Memorial & Museum at the World Trade 
Center as may be related to the expenditures of amounts paid under 
subsection (b).
SEC. 8. BUDGET COMPLIANCE.
    The budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying 
with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by 
reference to the latest statement titled ``Budgetary Effects of PAYGO 
Legislation'' for this Act, submitted for printing in the Congressional 
Record by the Chairman of the Committee on the Budget of the House of 
Representatives, provided that such statement has been submitted prior 
to the vote on passage.

                               Speaker of the House of Representatives.

                            Vice President of the United States and    
                                               President of the Senate.