Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/04/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/04/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/09/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/09/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/09/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/19/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/19/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/19/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/29/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/29/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/08/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/17/2010