Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/11/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/11/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/11/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/11/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/11/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/11/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/11/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/15/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/15/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/15/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/15/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/19/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/19/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/19/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/19/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/25/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/15/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/22/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/26/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/29/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/29/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/06/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/18/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/18/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/24/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/27/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/27/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/24/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/24/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/24/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/30/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/15/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/15/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/21/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 07/21/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/21/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/21/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/21/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/28/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/28/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/30/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/30/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/09/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/15/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/15/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/15/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/15/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/16/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 09/16/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/23/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/23/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 11/18/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/18/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/18/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/18/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/30/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/02/2010