Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/25/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/02/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/02/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/04/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/14/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/06/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/25/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/22/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/14/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/29/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/28/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/28/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/18/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/18/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/18/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/18/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/18/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/22/2010