Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/02/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/02/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 03/03/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/03/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/03/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/04/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/09/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/20/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/20/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/04/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/16/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/22/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/22/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/24/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/25/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/28/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/29/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/30/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/30/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/30/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/30/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/01/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/01/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/15/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/20/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/27/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/27/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/28/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/30/2010