Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/25/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/25/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/02/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/02/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/02/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/03/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/03/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/03/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/03/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/03/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/10/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/10/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/10/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/18/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/18/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/19/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/19/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/19/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/19/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/21/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/21/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/21/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/21/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/21/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/21/2010