Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/02/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/04/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/25/2010