Text: H.R.4707 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/25/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 4707


To extend the emergency unemployment compensation program through the end of fiscal year 2010.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

February 25, 2010

Mr. Schauer introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means


A BILL

To extend the emergency unemployment compensation program through the end of fiscal year 2010.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Unemployment Insurance Extension Act of 2010”.

SEC. 2. Extension of emergency unemployment compensation program through the end of fiscal year 2010.

(a) Emergency unemployment compensation.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Section 4007 of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended—

(A) by striking “February 28, 2010” each place it appears and inserting “September 30, 2010”;

(B) in the heading for subsection (b)(2), by striking “february 28, 2010” and inserting “september 30, 2010”; and

(C) in subsection (b)(3), by striking “July 31, 2010” and inserting “February 28, 2011”.

(2) ADDITIONAL REGULAR COMPENSATION.—Section 2002(e) of the Assistance for Unemployed Workers and Struggling Families Act, as contained in Public Law 111–5 (26 U.S.C. 3304 note; 123 Stat. 438), is amended—

(A) in paragraph (1)(B), by striking “February 28, 2010” and inserting “September 30, 2010”;

(B) in the heading for paragraph (2), by striking “february 28, 2010” and inserting “september 30, 2010”; and

(C) in paragraph (3), by striking “August 31, 2010” and inserting “March 31, 2011”.

(3) FULL FUNDING OF EXTENDED BENEFITS.—Section 2005 of the Assistance for Unemployed Workers and Struggling Families Act is amended—

(A) by striking “February 28, 2010” each place it appears and inserting “September 30, 2010”; and

(B) in subsection (c), by striking “July 31, 2010” and inserting “February 28, 2011”.

(4) EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY FEDERAL MATCHING FOR THE FIRST WEEK OF EXTENDED BENEFITS FOR STATES WITH NO WAITING WEEK.—Section 5 of the Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2008 (Public Law 110–449; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended by striking “July 31, 2010” and inserting “September 30, 2010”.

(5) TECHNICAL CORRECTION.—Section 4007(b)(2) of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 is amended by striking “of section 4002 of section 4002” and inserting “of section 4002”.

(b) Funding for temporary extension of certain unemployment benefits.—Section 4004(e)(1) of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 is amended—

(1) in subparagraph (B), by striking “and” at the end; and

(2) by adding after subparagraph (C) the following:

“(D) the amendments made by section 2 of the Unemployment Insurance Extension Act of 2010; and”.