Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 03/04/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/10/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/16/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/22/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/19/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/24/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/30/2010