Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/16/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/16/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/16/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/16/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/16/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/16/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/21/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/29/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew