Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/04/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/04/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/04/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/04/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 03/04/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/04/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/10/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/12/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/17/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/14/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/28/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/14/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/14/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 09/29/2010