Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/10/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/10/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/10/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/10/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/10/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/11/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/11/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/11/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/11/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/15/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/15/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/18/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/25/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/13/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/14/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/26/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/28/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/28/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/05/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/18/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/24/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/24/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/24/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/08/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/08/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/21/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/21/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 08/09/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 09/23/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/17/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/17/2010