Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/28/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/28/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/28/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/13/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/13/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/21/2010