Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/12/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/16/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/17/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/25/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/19/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/14/2010