Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/12/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/12/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/12/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/15/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/15/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/15/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/17/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/19/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/20/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/11/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/19/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/25/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/25/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/08/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/15/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/17/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/01/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/14/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/22/2010