Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/19/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/19/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/19/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/19/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/19/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/19/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/19/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 03/19/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/19/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/19/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/19/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/19/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/19/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/19/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/19/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/19/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/25/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/25/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/14/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/14/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/15/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/15/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/29/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/29/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/29/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/22/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/29/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/29/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/16/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/16/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/15/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/02/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 12/02/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/02/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/02/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/07/2010