There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Northern Border Counternarcotics Strategy Act of 2010

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Northern Border Counternarcotics Strategy Act of 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

Northern Border Counternarcotics Strategy Act of 2010

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Northern Border Counternarcotics Strategy Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Office of National Drug Control Policy Reauthorization Act of 2006 to require a northern border counternarcotics strategy, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-356. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010Presented to President.
12/21/2010Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8813)
12/20/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/20/2010Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/27/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 475).(text: CR H6104)
03/03/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-356. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010HousePresented to President.
12/21/2010-12:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/21/2010-12:03pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8813)
12/21/2010-11:55amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to concur in the Senate amendment to H.R. 4748.
12/21/2010-11:55amHouseMr. Scott (VA) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H8813-8814)
12/21/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2010SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/20/2010SenateS.Amdt.4915 Amendment SA 4915 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/20/2010SenateS.Amdt.4915 Amendment SA 4915 proposed by Senator Kerry for Senator Schumer. (consideration: CR S10805-10806; text: CR S10805-10806) In the nature of a substitute.
12/20/2010SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S10805-10806)
12/20/2010SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/28/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
07/27/2010-6:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/27/2010-6:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 475). (text: CR H6104)
07/27/2010-6:11pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6125-6126)
07/27/2010-2:43pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/27/2010-2:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4748.
07/27/2010-2:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6104-6106)
07/27/2010-2:32pmHouseMr. Scott (VA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/05/2010HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border, Maritime, and Global Counterterrorism.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/03/2010HouseReferred to House Homeland Security
03/03/2010HouseReferred to House Judiciary
03/03/2010HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/03/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/03/2010 Referred to
House Homeland Security03/03/2010 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border, Maritime, and Global Counterterrorism05/05/2010 Referred to
Senate Judiciary07/28/2010 Referred to
12/20/2010 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4748. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-356 (01/04/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on December 20, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Northern Border Counternarcotics Strategy Act of 2010 - Amends the Office of National Drug Control Policy Reauthorization Act of 2006 to require the Director of National Drug Control Policy, not later than 180 days after the enactment of this Act and every two years thereafter, to develop and submit to specified congressional committees a Northern Border Counternarcotics Strategy.  Requires such Strategy to: (1) set forth the strategy of the federal government for preventing the illegal trafficking of drugs across the international border between the United States and Canada, including through and between ports of entry; (2) state the specific roles and responsibilities of each relevant National Drug Control Program agency for implementing the strategy; (3) identify the specific resources required to enable the relevant agencies to implement the strategy; (4) reflect the unique nature of small communities along the border, ongoing cooperation and coordination with Canadian law enforcement authorities, and variations in the volumes of vehicles and pedestrians crossing through ports of entry along the border; and (5) include a strategy to end the illegal trafficking of drugs to or through Indian reservations on or near the border.